We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Fidelity Co Operative Bank Vs. Kennedy, Nicole L

Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago

Fidelity Co Operative Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Mariolis, Esq., Constantine T, against Kennedy, Nicole L, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts with Donatelle, Sharon presiding.

Case Details for Fidelity Co Operative Bank v. Kennedy, Nicole L

Judge

Donatelle, Sharon Track Judge’s New Cases

Filing Date

June 07, 2018

Category

Real Property

Last Refreshed

May 08, 2021

Practice Area

Property

Filing Location

Worcester County, MA

Matter Type

Foreclosure

Parties for Fidelity Co Operative Bank v. Kennedy, Nicole L

Plaintiffs

Fidelity Co Operative Bank

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Mariolis, Esq., Constantine T

Defendants

Kennedy, Nicole L

Case Events for Fidelity Co Operative Bank v. Kennedy, Nicole L

Type Description
Docket Event JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL (1-88) entered, service not completed for any party by deadline review. Judge: Donatelle, Hon. Sharon Entered and copies mailed : 11/27/2018 Judge: Donatelle, Hon. Sharon Judge: Donatelle, Hon. Sharon Judge: Donatelle, Hon. Sharon

Judge: Donatelle, Sharon

Docket Event General correspondence regarding copies of judgment mailed: 11/27/2018
Docket Event Document: A Judgment of Dismissal 1-88 was generated and sent to: Attorney: Constantine T Mariolis, Esq. Defendant: Nicole L Kennedy
Docket Event Notice to publish foreclosure Gardner News or Worcester Telegram & Gazette rec notice in the Worcester District Registry of Deeds and by regular mail, return at Worcester 07/19/2018 (Kenton-Walker, J. RAJ)
Docket Event Mortgagee's Affidavit notice has been sent because it is required under Section 11(e) of Chapter 244 Section 35A
Docket Event Civil action cover sheet filed.
Docket Event Case assigned to: DCM Track X - Accelerated was added on 06/07/2018
Docket Event Attorney appearance On this date Constantine T Mariolis, Esq. added for Plaintiff Fidelity Co Operative Bank
See all events