Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Irizarry, Luz Alicia, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Billet, Esq., Matthew Scott, Thomason, Esq., Danielle, against Smith, Donald J, Smith, Sheila M., represented by Mazzocca, Esq., Richard P, Merlino, Esq., Joseph A, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 07, 2016 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedJuly 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Original civil complaint filed.
Date: July 07, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Party(s) file Stipulation of Dismissal The parties stipulate that the action be dismissed in accordance with Mass.R.Civ.P.41, with prejudice and without costs. Notices mailed on 1/10/18. Applies To: Irizarry, Luz Alicia (Plaintiff); Smith, Donald J (Defendant); Smith, Sheila M. (Defendant) | |
September 22, 2017 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Joseph A Merlino, Esq. added for Defendant Sheila M. Smith | |
September 22, 2017 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Joseph A Merlino, Esq. added for Defendant Donald J Smith | |
August 02, 2017 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Richard P Mazzocca, Esq. added for Defendant Sheila M. Smith | |
August 02, 2017 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Jonathan Harris, Esq. dismissed/withdrawn for Defendant Sheila M. Smith | |
August 02, 2017 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Richard P Mazzocca, Esq. added for Defendant Donald J Smith | |
August 02, 2017 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Jonathan Harris, Esq. dismissed/withdrawn for Defendant Donald J Smith | |
August 12, 2016 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Jonathan Harris, Esq. added for Defendant Sheila M. Smith | |
August 12, 2016 | Docket Event | Received from Defendant Smith, Sheila M.: Answer with claim for trial by jury; | |
August 12, 2016 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Jonathan Harris, Esq. added for Defendant Donald J Smith |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.