Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Martello, Carolyn, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Foley, Esq., Paul C, against Genatossio, Philip, represented by Kiritsy, Esq., George P, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts with Rosemary Connolly presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 19, 2016 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedJuly 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Plaintiff Carolyn Martello's Motion for Leave to Withdraw
Date: July 16, 2018Joint Pre-Trial Memorandum filed: Filed in Court
Date: October 31, 2017Original civil complaint filed.
Date: May 19, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Hearing on Withdrawal of Attorney scheduled on: 09/18/2018 02:00 PM Has been: Canceled For the following reason: Case Settled Hon. Rosemary Connolly, Presiding Appeared: Staff: Laurie Jurgiel, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
Judge: Connolly, Rosemary |
|
August 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Conference to Review Status scheduled on: 09/18/2018 02:00 PM Has been: Canceled For the following reason: Case Settled Hon. Rosemary Connolly, Presiding Appeared: Staff: Laurie Jurgiel, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
Judge: Connolly, Rosemary |
|
August 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Party(s) file Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice Notices mailed on 08/23/18 Applies To: Martello, Carolyn (Plaintiff); Genatossio, Philip (Defendant) | |
August 02, 2018 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear Sent On: 08/02/2018 10:28:01 | |
August 02, 2018 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear Sent On: 08/02/2018 10:27:09 | |
August 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Conference to Review Status scheduled on: 09/06/2018 02:00 PM Has been: Rescheduled For the following reason: By Court prior to date Hon. Rosemary Connolly, Presiding Appeared: Staff: Laurie Jurgiel, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
Judge: Connolly, Rosemary |
|
July 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Carolyn Martello's Motion for Leave to Withdraw | |
July 12, 2018 | Docket Event | General correspondence regarding Court Received Letter from Defendant, Philip Genatossio, regarding releasing Attorney George P. Kiritsy as Attorney (See Attached) | |
June 18, 2018 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear Sent On: 06/18/2018 08:47:24 | |
June 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Conference to Review Status scheduled on: 06/14/2018 02:00 PM Has been: Held as Scheduled Comments: FTR - 2:17pm Hon. James G Reardon, Jr., Presiding Appeared: Staff: Laurie Jurgiel, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
Judge: James G Reardon, Jr. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.