Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Marcus, Jocelyn M, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Murray, Esq., Brian W, against Natoli, Thomas F, represented by Farrey Iii, Thomas B, Seliger, Esq., Brooke, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 27, 2016 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 23, 2017 | Docket Event | Party(s) file Stipulation Applies To: Marcus, Jocelyn M (Plaintiff); Natoli, Thomas F (Defendant); Seliger, Esq., Brooke (Attorney) on behalf of Natoli, Thomas F (Defendant); Murray, Esq., Brian W (Attorney) on behalf of Marcus, Jocelyn M (Plaintiff); Farrey III, Thomas B (Attorney) on behalf of Natoli, Thomas F (Defendant) | |
June 30, 2016 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant Natoli, Thomas F: Service made in hand; | |
May 03, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER: for Hospital Records from Sturdy Memorial Hospital certified copy mailed to Burns & Farrey 05/24/2016 (see attached) | |
May 03, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER: for Hospital Records from Milford Regional Center certified copy mailed to Burns & Farrey 05/24/2016 (see Attached) | |
May 03, 2016 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for Hospital Records (#4.0): ALLOWED | |
May 03, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER: for Hospital Records from University of Massachusetts Medical Center certified copy mailed to Burns & Farrey 05/24/2016 (see Attached) | |
May 03, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER: for Hospital Records from Dana Farber Hospital certified copy mailed to Burns & Farrey 05/24/2016 (see Attached) | |
April 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Certificate of Compliance Superior Court Rule 9A List of Documents: Notice of filing | |
April 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Defendant Thomas F Natoli's Motion for Hospital Records | |
April 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Brooke Seliger, Esq. added for Defendant Thomas F Natoli |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.