Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Rodriguez, Keylataiz, filed a(n) Criminal Related (Civil) - Criminal case represented by Ellis, Esq., Nicholas James, against City Of Worcester, Smith, Jeremy, represented by Madison, Esq., Jared John, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts with Daniel M. Wrenn presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 22, 2015 |
CategoryActions Involving The State/Municipality |
Last RefreshedJuly 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeCriminal Related (Civil) |
Joint Pre-Trial Memorandum filed: ( In court )
Date: September 18, 2018Original civil complaint filed.
Date: December 22, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Party(s) file Stipulation of Dismissal that this case is dismissed with prejudice, all rights of appeal waived, each party to bear its own costs. Notices mailed on 04/02/2019 (Certificate of Service attached) Applies To: Weiner, Esq., Rickie T (Attorney) on behalf of Rodriguez, Keylataiz (Plaintiff) | |
April 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Party status: Defendant City of Worcester: Dismissed by agreement of parties; | |
February 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Jury Trial scheduled on: 02/27/2019 09:00 AM Has been: Canceled For the following reason: Case Settled Hon. Daniel M Wrenn, Presiding Appeared: Staff: Cheryl Riddle, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
Judge: Wrenn, Daniel M |
|
February 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Final Trial Conference scheduled on: 02/19/2019 02:00 PM Has been: Canceled For the following reason: Case Settled Hon. Daniel M Wrenn, Presiding Appeared: Staff: Cheryl Riddle, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
Judge: Wrenn, Daniel M |
|
February 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Document: A Order for Entry of Dismissal Nisi was generated and sent to: Attorney: Nicholas James Ellis, Esq. Attorney: Brian A Schwartz, Esq. Attorney: Jared John Madison, Esq. | |
February 12, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER of dismissal nisi entered after action was reported settled; Agreement or Stipulation shall be filed in this court by 04/15/2019 | |
September 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Joint Pre-Trial Memorandum filed: ( In court ) | |
September 18, 2018 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear Sent On: 09/18/2018 15:06:51 | |
September 18, 2018 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear Sent On: 09/18/2018 15:02:44 | |
September 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on: 09/18/2018 02:00 PM Has been: Held as Scheduled Comments: FTR - 2:18PM Hon. Daniel M Wrenn, Presiding Appeared: Staff: Joanne Herring, Assistant Clerk Magistrate Cheryl Riddle, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
Judge: Wrenn, Daniel M |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.