Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Adamski, Tracy, filed a(n) Equitable Remedies case represented by Lemberg, Esq., Sergei, against Ford Motor Company, Inc, Lamoreaux Ford, Inc, represented by Mountain, Esq., Thomas Albert, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 22, 2015 |
CategoryEquitable Remedies |
Last RefreshedSeptember 19, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
|
Original civil complaint filed.
Date: December 22, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Party(s) file Stipulation with prejudice and without costs Applies To: Adamski, Tracy (Plaintiff); Ford Motor Company, Inc (Defendant); Lamoreaux Ford, Inc (Defendant) | |
April 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Thomas Albert Mountain, Esq. added for Defendant Ford Motor Company, Inc | |
February 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant Lamoreaux Ford, Inc: Service through person in charge / agent; | |
February 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant Ford Motor Company, Inc: Service through person in charge / agent; | |
December 22, 2015 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to Appoint a special process server (#3.0): ALLOWED | |
December 22, 2015 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to AG of complaint on chapter 93A Sent On: 12/22/2015 11:50:59 | |
December 22, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of 93A complaint sent to Attorney General | |
December 22, 2015 | Docket Event | Case assigned to: DCM Track F - Fast Track was added on 12/22/2015 | |
December 22, 2015 | Docket Event | Appearance entered On this date Sergei Lemberg, Esq. added for Plaintiff Tracy Adamski | |
December 22, 2015 | Docket Event | Tracy Adamski's MOTION for appointment of Special Process Server. Merrill Smallwood |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.