Case Last Refreshed: 5 years ago
Alice A. Rhea, California State Teachers' Retirement System, filed a(n) Family case represented by Pro Se, against William J. Munroe, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts Superior Court of Napa - Family.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 08, 2004 |
CategoryFamily |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2019 |
|
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of Napa - Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 31, 2006 | Action |
Notice 912910-Notice Filed/Issued By: 931220 - Attorney for Petitioner NOTICE [912910] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PETITIONER [931220] |
|
May 08, 2006 | Action |
Proof of Service 912310-Proof of Service Filed/Issued By: 931220 - Attorney for Petitioner PROOF OF SERVICE [912310] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PETITIONER [931220] |
|
May 05, 2006 | Action |
Stipulation and Order 913520-Stipulation and Order Filed/Issued By: 931220 - Attorney for Petitioner STIPULATION AND ORDER [913520] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PETITIONER [931220] |
|
March 15, 2006 | Action |
Notice 912910-Notice Filed/Issued By: 932220 - Attorney for Respondent NOTICE [912910] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR RESPONDENT [932220] |
|
March 06, 2006 | Action |
Converted Stat Closure Disposition Date: Mar 6 2006 Type: 944110 - Judgment/Order Manner : 942110 - After Hearing |
|
March 06, 2006 | Action |
Judgment 926110-Judgment Filed/Issued By: 931220 - Attorney for Petitioner JUDGMENT [926110] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PETITIONER [931220] |
|
March 06, 2006 | Action |
Notice 912910-Notice Filed/Issued By: 931220 - Attorney for Petitioner NOTICE [912910] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PETITIONER [931220] |
|
March 02, 2006 | Action |
Declaration: Default 913320-Declaration: Default Filed/Issued By: 931220 - Attorney for Petitioner |
|
February 28, 2006 | Action |
Notice 912910-Notice Filed/Issued By: 912410 - Claimant NOTICE [912910] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By CLAIMANT [912410] |
|
February 28, 2006 | Action |
Stipulation 913510-Stipulation Filed/Issued By: 931220 - Attorney for Petitioner STIPULATION [913510] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PETITIONER [931220] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.