We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Mass V 2002 Ford Taurus Sedan

Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago

Com Of Mass, filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case represented by Hautanen, Esq., Sandra L, against 2002 Ford Taurus Sedan, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts with Janet Kenton-Walker presiding.

Case Details for Com Of Mass v. 2002 Ford Taurus Sedan

Judge

Janet Kenton-Walker Track Judge’s New Cases

Filing Date

February 11, 2013

Category

Administrative Civil Actions

Last Refreshed

April 21, 2021

Practice Area

Criminal

Filing Location

Worcester County, MA

Matter Type

Forfeiture

Parties for Com Of Mass v. 2002 Ford Taurus Sedan

Plaintiffs

Com Of Mass

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Hautanen, Esq., Sandra L

Defendants

2002 Ford Taurus Sedan

Case Events for Com Of Mass v. 2002 Ford Taurus Sedan

Type Description
Docket Event DEFAULT JUDGMENT - (see judgment) ( Janet Kenton-Walker, Justice), Entered and Copies mailed 4/19/2013
Docket Event Motion (P#7) ALLOWED (Janet Kenton-Walker, Justice) Notices mailed 4/19/2013
Docket Event Tracking deadlines amended: Motion to change track from "F" to "A" - All'd; changed in header; Copies mailed 4/10/13
Docket Event Motion (P#2) ALLOWED (James R Lemire, Justice) Notices mailed 4/10/2013
Docket Event Plaintiff Com of Mass's MOTION for judgment of default against Josefino Lugo, Brian Rodriguez
Docket Event Default (55a) as to defendants Josefino Lugo, Brian Rodriguez. Copies mailed 3/14/2013
Docket Event Affidavit that Josefino Lugo, Brian Rodriguez are not in military service
Docket Event Request upon clerk to default (55a) re: Josefino Lugo, Brian Rodriguez by Com of Mass & Affidavit in support
Docket Event SERVICE RETURNED (summons): Josefino Lugo, Brian Rodriguez, service made on 2/14/2013
Docket Event Track changed to F, Origin 1, Type E95.
See all events