Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wells Fargo Bank Na, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Digiampaolo, Esq., Amie, against Pouliot, Jon R, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 23, 2014 |
CategoryReal Property |
Last RefreshedApril 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Default judgment (55b2) by court that the foreclosure sale is hereby rescinded & the foreclosure deed revoked. See 2 page order. ( John S. McCann, Justice), Copies mailed 4/3/2014 | |
April 01, 2014 | Docket Event | Motion (P#9) ALLOWED (John S. McCann, Justice) Notices mailed 4/3/2014 | |
March 27, 2014 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank NA's MOTION for judgment of default ; Certificate of service; Affidavit of no opposition ; certificate of service | |
March 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Motion (P#8) APPROVED (John S. McCann, Justice) Copies mailed 3/12/2014 | |
February 20, 2014 | Docket Event | Plaintiffs Agreement for judgment as to Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank NA and defendant Jon R Pouliot aka Jon Pouliot and Joint Motion for court order. | |
February 20, 2014 | Docket Event | Default (55a) as to defendant(s) TD Bank NA, TD Banknorth NA, Hickory Hills Estates Condominium Trust. A Motion for an assessment of damages and default judgment pursuant to Mass R Civ P 55(b)2 and subject to Mass R Civ P 54(b) and 55 (b)4 as amended by 03/20/2014 Copies mailed 2/20/2014 | |
February 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Request upon clerk to default (55a) re: TD Bank NA, TD Banknorth NA by Wells Fargo Bank NA | |
February 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Request upon clerk to default (55a) re: Hickory Hills Estates Condominium Trust by Wells Fargo Bank NA | |
January 23, 2014 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURNED (summons): Jon R Pouliot, Jon Pouliot, service made on 1/23/2014 (in hand ) | |
January 23, 2014 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURNED (summons): TD Bank NA, service made on 1/7/2014 long arm Affidavit |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.