Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Morand, Caitlin, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Bailey, Esq., Shawn Patrick, Donohue, Esq., John P, against Beauregard, Ryan, Mastrangelo, Brett A, represented by Barry, Esq., James W, Myhre, Esq., Jonathan R, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 16, 2013 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedApril 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
ORDER: see judgment below
Date: December 16, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 16, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER: see judgment below | |
December 16, 2015 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT of Dismissal: Failure to comply with nisi order. | |
December 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Event Result: The following event: Conference to Review Status scheduled for 12/09/2015 08:30 AM has been resulted as follows: Result: Held as Scheduled | |
November 05, 2015 | Docket Event | Document: A Order for Entry of Dismissal Nisi was generated and sent to: Attorney: John P Donohue, Esq. Attorney: Shawn Patrick Bailey, Esq. Attorney: James W Barry, Esq. Attorney: Jonathan R. Myhre, Esq. Attorney: Ann O'Malley, Esq. | |
November 05, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER of dismissal nisi entered after action was reported settled; Agreement or Stipulation shall be filed in this court by 12/04/2015 | |
June 22, 2015 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT pursuant to MRCP 54(b), the Court ORDERED separate and final Judgment. Therefore, it is ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the Complaint of the Plaintiff(s), Caitlin Morand be and hereby is dismissed against Defendant(s), Ryan Beauregard with statutory costs. Entered and Copies mailed 6/22/15 | |
June 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for separate and final judgment (#14.0): ALLOWED There being no just reason for delay. A separate and final judgment for defendant, Ryan Beauregard shall enter | |
June 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Event Result: The following event: Motion Hearing scheduled for 06/09/2015 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Held as Scheduled Appeared: | |
June 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Event Result: The following event: Rule 56 Hearing scheduled for 06/09/2015 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Canceled Reason: Joint request of parties Appeared: | |
June 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to withdraw summary judgment (#17.0): ALLOWED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.