Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Poulin Grain Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Lefebvre, Esq., Robert J, against Tarves, John F, Tarves, Mary L, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 14, 2013 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedApril 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 05, 2013 | Docket Event | Execution issued for plaintiff(s) v Mary L Tarves, John F Tarves in amount of $41,727.08, including interest and costs, issued to plaintiff(s) Attorney Robert J Lefebvre | |
March 08, 2013 | Docket Event | Request for execution | |
February 15, 2013 | Docket Event | Default judgmnt (55b1) by clerk v defendants Mary L Tarves, John F Tarves dba Natures Best Farmstand in amount of $40,008.16 plus interest from 12/20/2012 in the sum of $710.29 and its costs of action. Copies mailed 2/15/2013 | |
February 11, 2013 | Docket Event | Court received Correspondence letter re: plff is not asking for Attorneys Fees filed by Att Robert J Lefebvre | |
February 11, 2013 | Docket Event | Request upon clerk for default judgment (55b1) re: Mary L Tarves, John F Tarves, Natures Best Farmstand by Poulin Grain Inc | |
February 01, 2013 | Docket Event | Default (55a) as to defendants Mary L Tarves, John F Tarves. The plaintiff shall file a motion for an assessment of damages and default judgment pursuant to Mass.R.Civ.P.54(b) and 55(b)4 as amended by 03-03-2013 Copies mailed 2/5/2013 | |
February 01, 2013 | Docket Event | Request upon clerk to default (55a) re: Mary L Tarves, John F Tarves, Natures Best Farmstand by Poulin Grain Inc | |
January 14, 2013 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURNED: John F Traves(Defendant) 1/7/13 Last and usual place of abode) | |
January 14, 2013 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURNED: Mary L Travers(Defendant) 1/7/13 (in hand) | |
December 20, 2012 | Docket Event | Filing fee paid in the amount of $275.00 including $15.00 surcharge and $20.00 security fee. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.