Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Sahverdiyan, Arsine, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Soloperto, Esq., Philip, against Alhambra Acres Of Worcester , Inc., Avedian, Kristen, Milley, John, Charitable And Benevolent Association Of Worcester, Knights Of Columbus Religious, (total of 6) See All represented by Seliger, Esq., Brooke, Farrey, Iii, Esq., Thomas B, Wickstrom, Esq., Timothy P, Weinberg, Esq., Michael, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2011 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedApril 25, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 31, 2011 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with prejudice, without costs | |
January 24, 2011 | Docket Event | Atty Timothy P Wickstrom's notice of appearance for Knights of Columbus Religious, Charitable and Benevolent Association of Worcester | |
January 24, 2011 | Docket Event | Atty Thomas B. Farrey III's withdrawal of appearance filed re: Arsine Sahverdiyan | |
January 03, 2011 | Docket Event | Motion (P#22) ALLOWED (John S. McCann, Justice) Notices mailed 1/6/2011 | |
December 23, 2010 | Docket Event | Joint Motion to Extend the Tracking Order Deadlines | |
July 16, 2010 | Docket Event | ANSWER (amended complaint): Knights of Columbus Religious, Charitable and Benevolent Association of Worcester, John Milley, Kristen Avedian, Alhambra Acres of Worcester , Inc. &cj | |
July 16, 2010 | Docket Event | Atty Thomas B. Farrey III, Brooke P. Seliger's notice of appearance for Alhambra Acres of Worcester , Inc. | |
June 29, 2010 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURNED: Alhambra Acres of Worcester , Inc.(Defendant) 06/28/2010 ( agent person in charge) | |
June 29, 2010 | Docket Event | Motion (P#19) ALLOWED as for reconsideratrion. DENIED as to the defendant Michael Hackett effort to change the Court's earlier Rulings and Orders. (Dennis J. Curran, Justice). Notices mailed 6/29/2010 | |
June 25, 2010 | Docket Event | Defendant Michael Hackett's MOTION for reconsideration / Exhibits; Defts MEMO in support of opposition to Motion; Notice of Filing ; Rule 9A List of Documents; Affidavit of Rule 9A Compliance -CJ |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.