Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Comm Of Mass, filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case represented by Hautanen, Esq., Sandra L, against $340.00, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts with Janet Kenton-Walker presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 29, 2010 |
CategoryAdministrative Civil Actions |
Last RefreshedApril 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 06, 2010 | Docket Event | DEFAULT JUDGMENT - (see judgment) (Kenton-Walker, J) Entered and Copies mailed 4/6/10 | |
April 05, 2010 | Docket Event | Motion (P#6) ALLOWED (Janet Kenton-Walker, Justice) Notices mailed 4/6/2010 | |
March 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Default (55a) as to defendantThais Castro The plaintiff shall file a Motion for an assessment of damages and default judgment pursuant to Mass.R.Civ.P.55(b)2 and subject to Mass.R.Civ.P.54(b) and 55(b)4 as amended by 04-29-2010 Copies mailed 3/30/2010 | |
March 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Comm of Mass's MOTION for judgment of default against Thais Castro | |
March 29, 2010 | Docket Event | Affidavit that Thais Castro is not in military service | |
March 29, 2010 | Docket Event | Request upon clerk to default (55a) re: Thais Castro by Comm of Mass & Affidavit in support | |
December 01, 2009 | Docket Event | Return of Service of Process Re: Thais Castro, service made on 11/16/2009 (certified mail) | |
November 13, 2009 | Docket Event | Origin 1, Type E95, Track F. | |
November 13, 2009 | Docket Event | Complaint filed by Comm of Mass pursuant to M G L c 94C, Sec. 47 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.