Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Fairway Financial Realty Llc, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Foss, Esq., Mark S, against Uxbridge Crossing Llc, Cherrier, Robert F, represented by Roberti, Esq., James L, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 09, 2010 |
CategoryReal Property |
Last RefreshedApril 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 09, 2010 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL re: Robert F Cherrier, Uxbridge Crossing LLC; service not complete by deadline | |
November 24, 2009 | Docket Event | Motion (P#3) Withdrawn by moving party. (M. H. Kaplan, Justice). Notices mailed 12/1/2009 | |
November 10, 2009 | Docket Event | Hearing on (P#3) held, matter taken under advisement. (Mitchell H. Kaplan, Justice) | |
November 06, 2009 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Edward K Renaud JR | |
November 06, 2009 | Docket Event | Motion (P#3) Son to issue, returnable on tuesday 11/10/2009 @ 2pm in courtroom 20 (Peter W. Agnes, Justice). | |
November 06, 2009 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Fairway Financial Realty LLC's ex parte MOTION and MEMO in support of Ex Parte Real Estate Attachment | |
November 06, 2009 | Docket Event | Motion (P#2) Allowed (Peter W. Agnes, Justice). | |
November 06, 2009 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Fairway Financial Realty LLC's MOTION for appointment of special process server Francis J Trapasso & Associates | |
November 06, 2009 | Docket Event | Filing fee paid in the amount of $275 including $15.00 surcharge and $20.00 security fee. | |
November 06, 2009 | Docket Event | Origin 1, Type C03, Track F. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.