Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Republic Plumbing Supply Co Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Katz, Esq., David S, against Unibank, Gouin Iii, William J, Five Bills Incorporated, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts with Richard T. Tucker presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 18, 2010 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedApril 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion (#20.0): ALLOWED | |
September 29, 2015 | Docket Event | Republic Plumbing Supply Co Inc's MOTION for appointment of Special Process Server. Constable Mark Davis | |
November 23, 2010 | Docket Event | Execution issued for plaintiff(s) v Five Bills Incorporated, William J Gouin III in amount of $45,445.32, including interest and costs, issued to plaintiff(s) Attorney David S Katz | |
November 19, 2010 | Docket Event | Request for Execution | |
October 25, 2010 | Docket Event | ANSWER: Unibank(Defendant) | |
October 12, 2010 | Docket Event | Finding and Order for Approval of Attachment on Trustee Process in the amount of $45,000. . ( Garry V. Inge, Justice) | |
October 12, 2010 | Docket Event | Motion (P#13) ALLOWED. I find that if given prior notice there exists a likilihood that funds or credits possessed by the trustee would be depleted. (Garry V. Inge, Justice) Notices mailed 10/13/2010 | |
October 12, 2010 | Docket Event | ORDER approving trustee process in amt of $45000 (Richard Tucker, Justice); summons to Trustee issued | |
September 22, 2010 | Docket Event | Default judgmnt (55b2) by court v defendant(s) Five Bills Incorporated & William J Gouin III , individually & collectively the amount of $35,500.00 plus interest from 09/30/2009 in the sum of $4,166.67,plus attorneys fees in the amount of $4,413.00 and its costs of action as provided by law. ( Bruce R. Henry, Justice), Copies mailed 9/22/2010 | |
September 21, 2010 | Docket Event | Motion (P#14.2) ALLOWED in the amount of $4,413.00 (Bruce R. Henry, Justice) Notices mailed 9/22/2010 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.