Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Fierimonte, Carl, Ferrara, William, Coleman, Alan, Bennett, Fred, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Doucette, Esq., Stephen G, against American Classic Restorations Inc, Fulcher, Robert F, represented by Whyman, Esq., Ashley S, Gordon, Esq., Stephen F, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 16, 2010 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedApril 26, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 19, 2010 | Docket Event | Stipulation of voluntarily dismissal of all claims and cross-claims , with prejudice, without costs, | |
August 18, 2010 | Docket Event | Atty Stephen F Gordon, Ashley S Whyman's notice of appearance for Robert F Fulcher, American Classic Restorations Inc | |
June 24, 2010 | Docket Event | Summons on contempt issued re: Robert F Fulcher, American Classic Restorations Inc (John T. Lu, Justice) returnable 7/13/2010 | |
May 28, 2010 | Docket Event | Complaint for contempt filed by plffs | |
May 07, 2010 | Docket Event | Motion (P#12) ALLOWED (John T. Lu, Justice) Notices mailed 5/14/2010 | |
April 16, 2010 | Docket Event | ORDER: Findings on various motions - It is the court's intention that this order parallel the order made today in Lizotte v Fulcher, civil action no. 08-2257 (John T. Lu, Justice) Copies mailed 4/16/10 | |
December 17, 2009 | Docket Event | Hearing on (P#13.2) held, matter taken under advisement. (John T. Lu, Justice) | |
December 17, 2009 | Docket Event | Hearing on (P#13) held, matter taken under advisement. (John T. Lu, Justice) | |
November 19, 2009 | Docket Event | Defts' Opposition to Motion of Andrea D. Hogarth and Joseph C. Cove for leave to withdraw as their counsel of record in certain pending actions (RE#12) | |
November 17, 2009 | Docket Event | Copy of Plff's Motion for contempt against the defts and to modify the August 13, 2009 Order for approval of attachment to include specific language regarding the personal property of Robert F Fulcher & Affidavit of Att Stephen Doucette in support of the Motion & Rule 9A cert of compliacne (P#12) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.