Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Twing Jr, Reginald A, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Angelini, Esq., Gregory J, against Antonucci, Frank E, represented by Brown, Esq., Alan Everett, Bolotin, Esq., Steven J, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts with Richard T. Tucker presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard T. Tucker Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 31, 2009 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedApril 26, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 16, 2010 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with prejudice, without costs | |
November 19, 2010 | Docket Event | Motion (P#10) ALLOWED (Peter W Agnes, Jr., Justice) Notices mailed 11/29/2010 | |
November 15, 2010 | Docket Event | Defendant Frank E Antonucci's MOTION for Court Order to Obtain Plaintiff's Records from the Department of Children and Family ; Affidavit of Compliance ; Notice of Filing ; Certficate of service | |
October 21, 2009 | Docket Event | Default (55a) as to third party defendants Reginald A Twing Sr, Kathaleen Twing. Copies mailed 10/22/2009 | |
October 20, 2009 | Docket Event | Request upon clerk to default (55a) re:third party defendants Reginald A Twing Sr, Kathaleen Twing by third party plaintiff Frank E. Antonucci | |
September 17, 2009 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURNED: Kathaleen Twing(Defendant/3rd party) 9/10/09 (last and usual place of abode) | |
September 17, 2009 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURNED: Reginald A Twing Sr(Defendant/3rd party) 9/10/09 (last and usual place of abode) | |
August 11, 2009 | Docket Event | Complaint of 3d-party Plff. Frank E. Antonucci v three party defts' Reginald A. Twing, Sr. & Kathaleen Twing along with filing fee in the amt of $260.00 including security fee rec'd & cj. | |
July 20, 2009 | Docket Event | Motion (P#4) ALLOWED, no opposition, upon the filing of $260.00 entry fee (Richard T. Tucker, Justice) Notices mailed 7/29/2009 | |
July 09, 2009 | Docket Event | Deft. Frank E. Antonucci motion for leave to file third party complaint & affid. of compliance with Sup. Court Rule 9a |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.