Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Kevron Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Arakelian, Esq., Robert J, against Dugan, Brian M, Greene, Steven E, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 31, 2009 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedApril 26, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 12, 2011 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT of dismissal; failure to comply with Order dated 7/7/2011. (John S. McCann, Justice) Copies mailed 8/12/2011 | |
July 07, 2011 | Docket Event | Default (1-88) re: Steven E Greene, Brian M Dugan (Motion for Default Judgment and Assessment to be filed by 08/07/11 or complaint to be dismissed) | |
April 10, 2009 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURNED (summons): Deft Brian M Dugan, service made on 4/3/2009 (last and usual) | |
April 10, 2009 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURNED (summons): Deft Steven E Greene, service made on 4/3/2009 (last and usual) | |
March 31, 2009 | Docket Event | Motion (P#4) Following Hearing for Counsel for Plaintiff only Ex Parte Motion Allowed in the amount of $255,000.00 (Agnes, A) | |
March 31, 2009 | Docket Event | Findings and Ex Parte Order for Approval of Attachment in the amount of $225,000. . (Christine M Roach, Justice) | |
March 31, 2009 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Kevron Inc's ex parte MOTION for leave to attach Real Estate. | |
March 31, 2009 | Docket Event | Court received Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to Supreme Judicial Court Rule 1:21 | |
March 31, 2009 | Docket Event | Uniform Counsel Certification filed by Plaintiff's, attorney Robert J Arakelian | |
March 31, 2009 | Docket Event | Filing fee paid in the amount of $275 including $15.00 surcharge and $20.00 security fee. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.