Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Trustees Of The Green At Shrewsbury Condominium Trust, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Shaughnessy, Esq., Erik, against Ferreira, Hilda Dasilva, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 31, 2009 |
CategoryReal Property |
Last RefreshedApril 26, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 15, 2009 | Docket Event | Pleading-notice of voluntary dismissal-Atty. Erik Shaughnessy-reason-Judgment and order filed on 9/17/09 | |
September 17, 2009 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT and ORDER (See Judgment) (Kinder,J.) Entered and copies mailed 9/17/09 | |
September 10, 2009 | Docket Event | Motion (P#8) After hearing and consideration of the pleadings, the motion is ALLOWED (C. Jeffrey Kinder, Justice) Notices mailed 9/17/2009 | |
July 27, 2009 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Trustees of The Green at Shrewsbury Condominium Trust's MOTION for judgment of default and hearing on assessment of damages and issuance of notice to sell, Memo of assessment of damages, Affidavit of Property Manager, Affidavit of counsel, & cert of service | |
July 27, 2009 | Docket Event | Affidavit that Hilda Dasilva Ferreira is not in military service | |
July 16, 2009 | Docket Event | Default (55a) as to defendant Hilda DaSilva Ferreira and defts'/parties-in-interest, U.S. Bank, N.A.,N.D. and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc. The plff. shall file a motion for an assessment of damages and default judgment pursuant to MRCP55(b)2 and subject to MRCP 54(b) and 55(b)4 as amended by 8/16/09 | |
July 16, 2009 | Docket Event | Request upon clerk to default (55a) re: deft. Hilda DaSilva Ferreira & defts'/Parties-In-Interest U.S. Bank, N.A.,N.D.and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc. | |
April 27, 2009 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURNED (summons):deft./parties in interest US. Bank N.A.., N.D. by certified mailed-return receipt 4/14/09 & affid. of Atty. Erik Shaughnessy re: service | |
April 27, 2009 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURNED (summons) re: deft./ party in interest Mortgage Electronic Registraton System Inc. 4/13/09 (agent, person in charge at time of service) | |
April 27, 2009 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURNED: Hilda Dasilva Ferreira(Defendant) 4/9/09 (last and usual place of abode) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.