Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Vincent Oil Co Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Ehrhard, Esq., James Patrick, Cantara, Esq., Patricia J, against D'Auria, Michael L, D'Auria, Louis A, Berardi, Joseph K, Tappin, Matthew, Patriot Oil Heat Llc, (total of 5) See All represented by Mccarthy, Esq., Terrance J, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts with Richard T. Tucker presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 21, 2009 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedApril 26, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 12, 2010 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal including all counterclaims asserted or capable of being asserted herein, with prejudice, upon disbursement of funds in the amount of $38,000.00 | |
August 16, 2010 | Docket Event | Motion (P#28) DENIED without a hearing - My initial review of this motion did not include the full 9A packet. Upon review of the same, defendant's motion is DENIED. The Court will not order attorneys fees as requested by the plaintiff at this time (James R. Lemire, Justice) Notices mailed 8/18/2010 | |
August 16, 2010 | Docket Event | Opposition to Defendant's Motion in Limine filed by Vincent Oil Co Inc | |
August 13, 2010 | Docket Event | Motion (P#28) No action taken, motion in limine can be addressed by Trial Judge. Further defendant has failed to comply with Superior Court Rule 9A. (James R. Lemire, Justice). Notices mailed 8/13/2010 | |
August 05, 2010 | Docket Event | Defendants Patriot Oil Heat LLC, Matthew Tappin, Joseph K Berardi, Louis A D'Auria, & Michael L D'Auria's MOTION in limine | |
August 02, 2010 | Docket Event | Pleading, Motion in limine, returned to Terrance J McCarthy, Esq.: All pleadings must be filed with an original signature. | |
May 19, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice sent to appear for pre-trial conference on 10/12/2010 | |
April 30, 2010 | Docket Event | ORDER on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction is DENIED (See Order) (Richard T Tucker, Justice) Copies mailed 4/30/10 | |
April 27, 2010 | Docket Event | Hearing on (P#25) held, matter taken under advisement. (Richard T Tucker, Justice) | |
April 21, 2010 | Docket Event | TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER issued; returnable 4/27/2010 at 2:00pm in courtroom 25. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.