Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Cairns Jr, Richard W, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Bodanza, Esq., Mark C, against Salamone, Justin, Elaine Martin Trustee, Martin, Elaine, Robert L Martin Trustee, Martin, Robert, (total of 6) See All represented by Pappas, Esq., Charles Spiro, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts with Daniel M. Wrenn presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 16, 2009 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedNovember 16, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 14, 2016 | Docket Event | Exhibits Destroyed 4/14/16 | |
April 11, 2016 | Docket Event | Event Result: The following event: Conference to Review Status scheduled for 04/11/2016 08:30 AM has been resulted as follows: Result: Held as Scheduled | |
March 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice to claim trial exhibits on or before 04/08/2016 ALL UNCLAIMED EXHIBITS WILL BE DESTROYED. PLEASE CALL AHEAD. THANK YOU! | |
July 19, 2012 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT on jury verdict. It is Ordered and Adjudged: that judgment is hereby entered for the defendants, Bob Martins Bar Inc and Robert L Martin (the jury having found the plaintiff 51% negligent). (Daniel M Wrenn, Justice) Entered and copies mailed 7/19/12 | |
July 17, 2012 | Docket Event | Special Verdict of jury for Defendants | |
July 17, 2012 | Docket Event | Exhibits filed (1 thru 15) (Jane Esposito, Court Reporter) | |
July 17, 2012 | Docket Event | Defts proposed Jury instructions filed in court | |
July 17, 2012 | Docket Event | Motion (P#13) ALLOWED as to Elaine Martin Individually and as Trustee of Eight East Broadway Realty Trust (Daniel M. Wrenn, Justice) Notices mailed 7/19/2012 | |
July 17, 2012 | Docket Event | Defendant Bob Martins Bar Inc, Robert Martin, Robert L Martin Trustee, Elaine Martin, Elaine Martin Trustee, Justin Salamone's MOTION for Directed Verdict pursuant to MRCP 50 at close of Plffs case filed in court | |
March 20, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice sent to appear for trial by jury on 7/16/2012 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.