Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Spencer Savings Bank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Gibbons, Esq., Robert B, Murphy, Esq., Jessica Estelle, against Fontaine, David, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts with Richard T. Tucker presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard T. Tucker Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 15, 2009 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedApril 25, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 12, 2016 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT of dismissal, Spencer Savings Bank failed to comply with an ORDER after review of the Docket dated 11/18/2016. It is ORDERED and ADJUDGED: that the complaint be and hereby is dismissed without prejudice. Entered and Copies Mailed 12/12/2016 | |
December 09, 2016 | Docket Event | Event Result: The following event: Conference to Review Status scheduled for 12/09/2016 08:30 AM has been resulted as follows: Result: Held as Scheduled | |
November 18, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER sent for Status Review, if notice is not received by 12/06/2016 the complaint will be dismissed. | |
February 06, 2012 | Docket Event | Court received Notice of Status Review from Attorney Gibbons re: Pending in Bankruptcy | |
January 25, 2012 | Docket Event | ORDER sent for Status Review of Defendant, David Fontaine Bankruptcy on 1/25/2012. Copies mailed 1/25/2012 | |
August 25, 2011 | Docket Event | Court received letter from Atty Michael P Murphy re: bankruptcy still pending | |
August 15, 2011 | Docket Event | Attorney Robert B Gibbons for Spencer Savings Bank, Notice of change of address | |
February 25, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER ON SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY - (see order) (Dennis J. Curran, Justice) Copies mailed 2/28/11 | |
December 27, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice of Litigation Control Conference on 2/7/2011, copies mailed 12/27/2010 | |
August 12, 2010 | Docket Event | Motion (P#9) This Courts order of 12/17/09 does not require the bank to take any action to maintain the property. The defendant,David Fontaine having placed his ownership interest in the property in the banking trustee lacks standing to bring this action. The action for contempt is DISMISSED. (Richard T. Tucker, Justice). Notices mailed 8/13/2010 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.