Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wachovia Bank Na, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Dussi, Esq., John Joseph, against Milford Hardwood Floors Inc, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts with Richard T. Tucker presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard T. Tucker Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2010 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedApril 25, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 18, 2010 | Docket Event | Execution issued for plaintiff(s) v Milford Hardwood Floors Inc in amount of $70,971.87, including interest and costs, issued to plaintiff(s) Attorney John J Dussi | |
June 03, 2010 | Docket Event | Request for execution by the plaintiff | |
May 17, 2010 | Docket Event | Default judgment (55b1). It is hereby Ordered: Judgment for the plaintiff, Wachovia Bank NA on default of the defendant, Milford Hardwood Floors Inc for failure to plead or otherwise defend against the complaint, in the sum of $66,462.39 with interest thereon from 12/11/09 in the sum of $3,321.33 as provided by law, with costs. (Tucker,J.) Entered and copies mailed 5/17/10 | |
April 28, 2010 | Docket Event | Motion (P#5.1) ALLOWED in the amount of $66,462.39 (Richard T. Tucker, Justice) Notices mailed 5/12/2010 | |
April 27, 2010 | Docket Event | Affidavit in support of Plaintiffs MOTION to assess Damages and for the entry of Final Judgement, certificate prusuant to rule 106(b) | |
March 10, 2010 | Docket Event | Request upon clerk for default judgment (55b1) re: Milford Hardwood Floors Inc | |
March 10, 2010 | Docket Event | Plff's MOTION to assess damages and to enter final judgment | |
February 23, 2010 | Docket Event | Default (55a) as to defendant Milford Hardwood Floors Inc. The plaintiff shall file a Motion for an assessment of damages and default judgment pursuant to Mass.R.Civ.P. 54 (b) and 55(b)4 as amended by 03-25-2010Copies mailed 2/23/2010 | |
February 22, 2010 | Docket Event | Request upon clerk to default (55a) re: Milford Hardwood Floors Inc by Wachovia Bank NA | |
January 08, 2010 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURNED: Milford Hardwood Floors Inc(Defendant) 12-21-2009 (agent, person in charge) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.