Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Xarras, James L, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Cahn, Esq., James M, against Dembrowski, Bunnell, Dombrowski, Aveni, represented by Stone, Esq., Michael J, Mccall, Esq., Robert A, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts with Daniel M. Wrenn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel M. Wrenn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2012 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedApril 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 05, 2013 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with prejudice. The Plaintiff herby waives any claim to costs and/or fees and herby waives all rights to appeal. | |
February 14, 2013 | Docket Event | Nisi dismissal; agreement or stipulation to be filed by 3/16/2013 (Daniel M. Wrenn, Justice) Copies mailed 2/14/13 | |
January 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's MOTION for withdrawal of the Plaintiff's admissions and for leave to serve late response; Plaintiff's Memo in Support Filed; Defendants OPPOSITION to motion | |
January 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Defendant Aveni Dombrowski, Bunnell Dembrowski's Renewed MOTION for Summary Judgment; Memo in Support Filed ; Plaintiff's OPPOSITION to Defendants motion; Plaintiff's Memo in Support of Opposition filed; Rule 9A Statement of Undisputed Material Facts ; List of Documents ; Notice of filing ; | |
January 22, 2013 | Docket Event | Motion (P#17) ALLOWED up to 5 pages (Daniel M. Wrenn, Justice) Notices mailed 1/23/2013 | |
January 22, 2013 | Docket Event | Court received letter from Atty Timothy Pomarole re: request for leave to file reply brief | |
July 26, 2012 | Docket Event | Joint pre-trial memorandum filed in Court | |
July 26, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice sent to appear for trial by jury on 3/13/2013 | |
May 07, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice sent to appear for pre-trial conference on .7/10/2012 | |
April 05, 2012 | Docket Event | Motion (P#15) ALLOWED (Daniel M. Wrenn, Justice) Notices mailed 4/5/2012 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.