Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Boutwell Owens & Co Inc, filed a(n) Equitable Remedies case represented by Felper, Esq., David Michael, Collins, Esq., Christine S, against Santiago, Myriam, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts with David P. Despotopulos presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 11, 2007 |
CategoryEquitable Remedies |
Last RefreshedApril 25, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 15, 2007 | Docket Event | Amended Judgment: -It is ORDERED & ADJUDED that and until further order of the court, the application under the prayers of the complaint is hereby granted; and the defendant, Myriam Santiago her agents, servants, attorneys and deputies are Enjoined and Restrained from: contacting Boutwell or Boutwell's employees while on the Company's premises, and/or entering Boutwell's place of business located at 251 Authority Drive Fitchburg MA. (Lemire, J.) Entered and copies mailed 8/15/07 (James R. Lemire, Justice) | |
August 08, 2007 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT and Permanent Injunction. It is Ordered and Adjudged: that and until further order of the court, the application under the prayers of the complaint is hereby granted; and the defendant, Myriam Santiago her agents, servants, attorneys and deputies are Enjoined and Restrained from: contacting Boutwell or Boutwell's employees while on the Company's premises, and/or entering Boutwell's place of business located at 253 Authority Drive Fitchburg MA. (Lemire, J.) Entered and copies mailed 8/8/07 | |
July 23, 2007 | Docket Event | MOTION (P#14) Permanent Injunction to Issue. (James R. Lemire, Justice). Notices mailed 7/23/2007 | |
July 05, 2007 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Boutwell Owens & Co Inc's MOTION for entry of final judgment, Atty Christine S Collins' Affidavit, & cert of service | |
June 20, 2007 | Docket Event | Default (55a) as to defendant Myriam Santiago. The plaintiff shall file a Motion for an assessment of damages and default judgment pursuant to Mass.R.Civ.P.55(b)2 and subject to Mass.R.Civ.P.54(b) by 07/21/2007 Copies mailed 6/22/2007 | |
June 20, 2007 | Docket Event | Request upon clerk to default (55a) re: Myriam Santiago by Boutwell Owens & Co Inc | |
May 21, 2007 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Harry Kliss, filed in Court. | |
May 21, 2007 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Martha Perez, filed in Court. | |
May 21, 2007 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURNED: Myriam Santiago(Defendant) Service made on TRO on 5/15/07 at L & U . | |
May 21, 2007 | Docket Event | MOTION (P#3) The defendant not appearing and after hearing from the plaintiff, this injunction is ALLOWED and is to remain in effect until 11/26/07. See Order (James R. Lemire, Justice). Notices mailed 5/22/2007 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.