Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Zimatravich, John, Bates, James M, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Welsh, Jr., Esq., Richard Matthew, against Richard Dumas Trustee, Robert Morton Trustee, Morton, Robert, represented by Seliger, Esq., Brooke, Toomey, Esq., Kathryn A, Farrey, Iii, Esq., Thomas B, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 02, 2007 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedApril 27, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 31, 2008 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT (33a) for defendants Robert Morton Trustee, Richard Dumas Trustee with costs as to plaintiff John Zimatravich Copies mailed 7/31/2008 | |
July 31, 2008 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT (33a) for defendants Robert Morton Trustee, Richard Dumas Trustee with costs as to plaintiff James M. Bates Copies mailed 7/31/2008 | |
July 29, 2008 | Docket Event | Application (33a) of Defts Robert Morton Trustee of Woodland Oaks Town Homes Condominium Trust, Richard Dumas Trustee, of Woodland Oaks Town Homes Condominium Trust v. Plaintiff, John Zimatravich for Final Judgment and affidavit. | |
July 29, 2008 | Docket Event | Application (33a) of Defendants, Robert Morton Trustee of Woodland Oaks Town Homes Condominium Trust, Richard Dumas Trustee of Woodland Oaks Town Homes Condominium v. Plaintiff, James M Bates for Final Judgment and affidavit. | |
July 14, 2008 | Docket Event | Copy of discharge of Defendant, Robert Morton's bankruptcy from the United States Bankruptcy Court | |
June 25, 2008 | Docket Event | Motion (P#18) No Opposition having been filed, this motion is ALLOWED. Plaintiff John Zimatravich is ordered to respond to defendant's request for production within 30 days from the date of this order. (James R. Lemire, Justice) Notices mailed 6/27/2008 | |
June 25, 2008 | Docket Event | Motion (P#17) No Opposition having been filed, this motion is ALLOWED. Plaintiff James Bates is Ordered to respond to request for production within 30 days of the date of this order. (James R. Lemire., Justice) Notices mailed 6/27/2008 | |
June 20, 2008 | Docket Event | Defts Robert Morton Trustee and Richard Dumas Trustee of Woodland Oaks Town Homes Condominium Trust's MOTION to compel production of documents of plff John Zimatravich & Affidavit of Compliance with Sup.Court Rule 9A filed by Att. Thomas B. Farrey III | |
June 20, 2008 | Docket Event | Defts Robert Morton Trustee and Richard DumasTrustee of Woodland Oaks Town Homes Condominium Trust's MOTION to compel production of documents from plff James M. Bates & Affidavit of Compliance with Sup.Court Rule 9A filed by Att. Thomas B. Farrey III | |
May 12, 2008 | Docket Event | Motion (P#13) ALLOWED, no opposition having been filed (James R. Lemire, Justice) Notices mailed 5/22/2008 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.