Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Leboeuf Ppa, Lindsey, Leboeuf, Jeanne M, Leboeuf, Mark F, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Astukewicz, Esq., Barry Joseph, against Lawrence, Dixie M, represented by Flanagan, Esq., William Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 05, 2000 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedNovember 16, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2001 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with prejudice, without costs and all rights of appeal waived. Copies mailed 12/26/01 | |
February 20, 2001 | Docket Event | ANSWER: Dixie M Lawrence(Defendant)-CJ | |
February 07, 2001 | Docket Event | Atty W. Joseph Flanagan's Notice of appearance for deft. Dixie M. Lawrence | |
February 01, 2001 | Docket Event | Affidavit of RMV re: Dixie M Lawrence | |
December 05, 2000 | Docket Event | Origin 1, Type B03, Track F. | |
December 05, 2000 | Docket Event | Complaint & civil action cover sheet filed and Rule 29 statement -cj |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.