Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Mcwhinney-Morse, Susan P, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County, MA, . Suffolk County, MA Superior Courts Suffolk County Probate and Family Court with Rivers, Hon. Janine D presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 25, 2021 |
CategoryEstates And Administration |
Last RefreshedAugust 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, MA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseSuffolk County Probate and Family Court |
Affidavit as to Military Service
Date: August 25, 2021Massachusetts/Federal Estate Tax Closing Letter
Date: June 06, 2022Order for Informal Probate of Will and/or Appointment of Personal Representative
Date: March 03, 2022Return of Service on Notice of Informal Probate
Date: August 25, 2021Permanent Bond Without Sureties Filed filed by Susan P. McWhinney-Morse
Date: August 25, 2021Devisees
Date: August 25, 2021Will dated 10/4/18, 10pgs.
Date: August 25, 2021Surviving Spouse, Children, Heirs at Law
Date: August 25, 2021Petition for Informal Probate
Date: August 25, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Massachusetts/Federal Estate Tax Closing Letter | |
March 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Permanent Bond Approved of Personal Representative dated 03/03/2022, by Kristen Antolini | |
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Order for Informal Probate of Will and/or Appointment of Personal Representative | |
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Letters Issued. Letters of Authority for Personal Representative Sent On: 03/03/2022 14:20:51 | |
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit as to Military Service | |
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | M. McNeely Esposito, as Trustee Interested Person(s) , Filed Form MPC 455 to Assent and Waive Notice to an Informal Probate, , | |
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Return of Service on Notice of Informal Probate | |
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | A. A. Ragan McNeely, as Trustee Interested Person(s) , Filed Form MPC 455 to Assent and Waive Notice to an Informal Probate, , | |
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | S. P. McWhinney-Morse Interested Person(s) , Filed Form MPC 455 to Assent and Waive Notice to an Informal Probate, , | |
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Permanent Bond Without Sureties Filed filed by Susan P. McWhinney-Morse |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.