Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Aroesty, Adam, Levenson, Jacob, Oceans Forward, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Cohen, Esq., Aaron, against Boston Harbor Sailing Club, Inc, Healey, Mark A., Jones, Julia, in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County, MA, . Suffolk County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 22, 2024 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedApril 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Notice of 93A complaint sent to Attorney General
Date: April 23, 2024Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: April 22, 2024Original civil complaint filed.
Date: April 22, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of 93A complaint sent to Attorney General | |
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction (#3.0): Other action taken Motion is allowed in that the TRO is granted a Short Order with hearing on May 6, 2024. (dated 4/22/2024) Notice in hand | |
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Summons and order of notice issued on a Motion for a Preliminary Injunction , returnable on 05/06/2024 02:30 PM Motion Hearing. | |
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Affidavit Applies To: Cohen, Esq., Aaron (Attorney) on behalf of Aroesty, Adam, Levenson, Jacob, Oceans Forward (Plaintiff) | |
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Adam Aroesty, Jacob Levenson, Oceans Forward's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction | |
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Civil action cover sheet filed. | |
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Original civil complaint filed. | |
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Case assigned to: DCM Track F - Fast Track was added on 04/22/2024 | |
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Aaron Cohen, Esq. added for Plaintiff Oceans Forward | |
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Aaron Cohen, Esq. added for Plaintiff Jacob Levenson |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.