Case Last Refreshed: 45 minutes ago
Badalato, Richard, Badalato, Sheila, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Di Marco, Esq., Roberto Luigi, Foster, Esq., Jennifer Martin, against 617 Managing Group Llc, 617 Therapeutic Health Care, Inc., 617 Therapeutic Health Center, Inc., 617 Therapeutic Holding Company, Chung, (total of 8) See All represented by Liu, Esq., Chase, in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County, MA, . Suffolk County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 04, 2023 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedMay 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
This complaint was filed on December 4, 2023, in the Suffolk Superior Court in Massachusetts. The plaintiffs, Richard Badolato and Sheila Badolato, are individuals residing in Danvers, Massachusetts. The defendants in this case are 617 Therapeutic Ho...
Plaintiff Richard Badalato's Request for summonses
Date: April 26, 2024Amended: amended complaint filed by Richard Badalato, Sheila Badalato
Date: April 25, 2024Opposition to Defendants' motion to dismiss filed by Richard Badalato, Sheila Badalato
Date: February 05, 2024Service Returned for Applies To: 617 Therapeutic Holding Company (Defendant)
Date: January 08, 2024Service Returned for Applies To: 617 Therapeutic Health Care, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: January 08, 2024Service Returned for Applies To: 617 Therapeutic Health Center, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: January 08, 2024Service Returned for Applies To: 617 Managing Group Llc (Defendant)
Date: January 08, 2024Service Returned for Applies To: Gin, Richard (Defendant)
Date: January 08, 2024Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: December 04, 2023Complaint electronically filed.
Date: December 04, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Docket Note: 3 summonses sent by mail | |
April 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Richard Badalato's Request for summonses | |
April 25, 2024 | Docket Event | Amended: amended complaint filed by Richard Badalato, Sheila Badalato | |
February 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Reply/Sur-reply Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to dismiss pursuant to Massachusetts Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) | |
February 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Opposition to Defendants' motion to dismiss filed by Richard Badalato, Sheila Badalato | |
February 05, 2024 | Docket Event | 617 Therapeutic Holding Company, 617 Therapeutic Health Care, Inc., 617 Therapeutic Health Center, Inc., 617 Managing Group Llc, Richard Gin's Memorandum in support of motion to dismiss pursuant to Massachusetts Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) | |
February 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Defendant 617 Therapeutic Holding Company, 617 Therapeutic Health Care, Inc., 617 Therapeutic Health Center, Inc., 617 Managing Group Llc, Richard Gin's Motion to dismiss pursuant to Massachusetts Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) | |
January 08, 2024 | Docket Event | Defendants 617 Therapeutic Holding Company, 617 Therapeutic Health Care, Inc., 617 Therapeutic Health Center, Inc., 617 Managing Group Llc, Richard Gin's Notice of Motion to Dismiss | |
January 08, 2024 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Applies To: 617 Therapeutic Holding Company (Defendant) | |
January 08, 2024 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Applies To: 617 Therapeutic Health Care, Inc. (Defendant) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.