Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Phillip, Sharon, Savanna Phillip, Ppa Sharon Phillip, Shamar Phillip, Ppa Sharon Phillip, Steve Phillip, Ppa Sharon Phillip, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Meyer, Jr., Esq., Andrew C, against Brisas Marie Truncali, M.D., A.K.A. Brisas Marie Flores, M.D., Goldowsky, Md, Alexander, Horn, Md, Amanda Nicole, Jacquet, Md, Gabrielle, Xxxxxxx, Md, Xxxxx, (total of 5) See All represented by Barkley, Esq., Michael B, Coppola, Esq., Rebecca, in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County, MA, . Suffolk County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 26, 2023 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedJanuary 23, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, MA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
This complaint was filed in the Superior Court of Suffolk, Massachusetts. The plaintiffs are Sharon Phillip, Savannah Phillip (acting as the power of attorney for Sharon Phillip), Shamar Phillip (acting as the power of attorney for Sharon Phillip), a...
Received from Defendant xxxxxxx, MD, xxxxx: Answer with claim for trial by jury;
Date: January 10, 2024Received from Defendant Horn, MD, Amanda Nicole: Answer with claim for trial by jury;
Date: January 10, 2024Service Returned for Defendant Horn, MD, Amanda Nicole: Service via certified mail;
Date: January 19, 2024Received from Defendant Goldowsky, MD, Alexander: Answer with claim for trial by jury;
Date: January 10, 2024Affidavit of Service of Process via Long Arm Statute
Date: January 19, 2024Received from Defendant Jacquet, MD, Gabrielle: Answer with claim for trial by jury;
Date: January 10, 2024Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: October 26, 2023Complaint electronically filed.
Date: October 26, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant Horn, MD, Amanda Nicole: Service via certified mail; | |
January 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service of Process via Long Arm Statute | |
January 10, 2024 | Docket Event | Received from Defendant xxxxxxx, MD, xxxxx: Answer with claim for trial by jury; | |
January 10, 2024 | Docket Event | Received from Defendant Brisas Marie Truncali, M.d., A.k.a. Brisas Marie Flores, M.d.: Answer with claim for trial by jury; | |
January 10, 2024 | Docket Event | Received from Defendant Horn, MD, Amanda Nicole: Answer with claim for trial by jury; | |
January 10, 2024 | Docket Event | Received from Defendant Goldowsky, MD, Alexander: Answer with claim for trial by jury; | |
January 10, 2024 | Docket Event | Received from Defendant Jacquet, MD, Gabrielle: Answer with claim for trial by jury; | |
January 10, 2024 | Docket Event | Received from Defendant Horn, MD, Amanda Nicole: 1st Answer in Medical Malpractice Applies To: Horn, MD, Amanda Nicole (Defendant) | |
December 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant Brisas Marie Truncali, M.d., A.k.a. Brisas Marie Flores, M.d.: Service via certified mail; | |
October 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Case assigned to: DCM Track A - Average was added on 10/27/2023 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.