Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Johnson, Steven, filed a(n) Administrative Civil Actions case represented by Cohen, Esq., Laurence J, against Commissioner Carol Mici, Secretary Terrence Reidy, Superintendent Shawn Zoldak, represented by Colonese, Esq., Courtney R, in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County, MA, . Suffolk County, MA Superior Courts with Anthony M. Campo, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 08, 2023 |
CategoryAdministrative Civil Actions |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSuffolk County, MA |
|
Complaint electronically filed.
Date: March 08, 2023Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: March 08, 2023Plaintiff Steven Johnson's Motion to waive filing fee
Date: March 08, 2023Service Returned for Defendant Secretary Terrence Reidy: Service via certified mail;
Date: April 18, 2023Service Returned for Defendant Commissioner Carol Mici: Service via certified mail;
Date: April 18, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Steven Johnson's Assented to Motion to Join Appeal of Request for Reconsideration for Medical Parole with Pending Appeal of Denial of Medial Parole Petition | |
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Conference to Review Status scheduled on: 08/08/2023 02:00 PM Has been: Held as Scheduled Hon. Anthony M. Campo, Presiding Staff: Timothy C Walsh, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
Judge: Campo, Anty M. |
|
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to Stay Pending Petitioner's Request For Reconsideration Of The Denial Of His Petition For Medical Parole (#8.0): ALLOWED Allowed as assented to. (Dated: 7/19/23) Notice sent 7/20/23 | |
July 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Steven Johnson's Submission of Second Assented To Stay Pending Petitioner's Request For Reconsideration Of The Denial Of His Petition For Medical Parole | |
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to stay pending petitioner's request for reconsideration of the denial of his petition for medical parole (#7.0): ALLOWED For reasons stated herein, ALLOWED. A conference review status will be scheduled in approximately 60 days. (Dated 5/8/2023) Notice sent 5/9/2023 | |
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Steven Johnson's Assented to Motion to Stay pending Petitioner's Request for Reconsideration of the Denial of his Petition for Medical Parole | |
April 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant Secretary Terrence Reidy: Service via certified mail; | |
April 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant Commissioner Carol Mici: Service via certified mail; | |
April 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant Superintendent Shawn Zoldak: Service via certified mail; | |
March 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Docket Note: Two summonses by mail |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.