Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
266 Border Llc, filed a(n) Agency Action - Administrative case represented by Heyer, Esq., Kathleen M, Orsmond, Esq., Gareth I, Pinto, Jr., Esq., Donald R, against Office Of Coastal Zone Management Within The Executive Office Of Energy And Environmental Affairs, represented by Fowler, Esq., Erin E, Reynolds, Esq., Maryanne, in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County, MA, . Suffolk County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 19, 2023 |
CategoryAdministrative Civil Actions |
Last RefreshedJanuary 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, MA |
Matter TypeAgency Action |
Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: January 19, 2023Complaint electronically filed.
Date: January 19, 2023266 Border LLC's Memorandum in support of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
Date: January 17, 2024Plaintiff 266 Border LLC's Assented to Motion to Modify Briefing Schedule
Date: July 25, 2023Plaintiff 266 Border LLC's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
Date: January 17, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event | Plaintiff 266 Border LLC's Statement of material facts in support of their joint motion for partial summary judgment | |
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event | 266 Border LLC's Memorandum in support of Joint Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (with Sixty Border Street, LLC) | |
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event | Reply/Sur-reply EBCDC Inc.'s Consolidated Reply in Support of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and for Summary Judgment | |
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event | Defendant Office Of Coastal Zone Management Within The Executive Office Of Energy And Environmental Affairs's Cross Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and Opposition to Motions for Summary Judgment | |
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event | Plaintiff 266 Border LLC's Joint Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (with Sixty Border Street, LLC) | |
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event | 266 Border LLC's Memorandum in support of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings | |
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event | Plaintiff 266 Border LLC's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings | |
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event | Reply/Sur-reply 266 Border LLC and Sixty Border Street LLC's Joint Consolidated Reply in Support of Motions for Judgment on the Pleadings and for Summary Judgment | |
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Karina Dodor, Esq. dismissed/withdrawn for Plaintiff Sixty Border Street, Llc Copied from linked case: 2384CV00194 | |
October 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to enlarge time for Defendant's response to Plaintiffs' motions for judgment on the pleadings and motions for summary judgment (#7.0): ALLOWED Motion to Enlarge tile ALLOWED as contained herein. (Dated: 10/2/23) Notice sent 10/05/23 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.