Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Bonds, Jonathan, filed a(n) Agency Action - Administrative case represented by Pro Se, against Contributory Retirement Appeal Board Crab, represented by Martland, Esq., Douglas Shreve, in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County, MA, . Suffolk County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2021 |
CategoryAdministrative Civil Actions |
Last RefreshedOctober 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, MA |
Matter TypeAgency Action |
Original civil complaint filed.
Date: June 30, 2021Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: June 30, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Judgment. It is ORDERED and ADJUDGED:: that the Plaintiff was Ordered by the Court, Roach, J., on 1/25/2022 to file their motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and no response was received. Accordingly, Plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED. entered on docket pursuant to Mass R Civ P 58(a) and notice sent to parties pursuant to Mass R Civ P 77(d) | |
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Administrative record filed:(hard copy) Applies To: Contributory Retirement Appeal Board CRAB (Defendant) | |
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Administrative record filed: To be filed in Person. Applies To: Contributory Retirement Appeal Board CRAB (Defendant) | |
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance electronically filed. Applies To: Martland, Esq., Douglas Shreve (Attorney) on behalf of Contributory Retirement Appeal Board CRAB (Defendant) | |
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer to original complaint Applies To: Contributory Retirement Appeal Board CRAB (Defendant) | |
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Douglas Shreve Martland, Esq. added for Defendant Contributory Retirement Appeal Board CRAB | |
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Original civil complaint filed. | |
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil action cover sheet filed. | |
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Case assigned to: DCM Track X - Accelerated was added on 06/30/2021 | |
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Pro Se added for Plaintiff Jonathan Bonds |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.