Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Seafan Realty Trust Llc, Wheaton, Kathryn, filed a(n) Equitable Remedies case represented by Pro Se, against 3C Tcp Llc, Meade, Thomas F, Touchstone Capital Partners Commercial Funding Llc, represented by Barbadoro, Esq., Paul N, Kroha, Esq., Kimberly K, in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County, MA, . Suffolk County, MA Superior Courts with Joseph F. Leighton, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph F. Leighton, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2021 |
CategoryEquitable Remedies |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSuffolk County, MA |
|
Original civil complaint filed.
Date: September 03, 2021Exhibits/Appendix Affidavit of Thomas Meade
Date: September 08, 2021Defendant 3C TCP LLC's Notice of Motion to Dismiss.
Date: September 30, 2021Attorney appearance On this date Kimberly K Kroha, Esq. added for Defendant 3C TCP LLC
Date: September 08, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for Withdrawal and Dismissal of this Case (#18.0): ALLOWED (date 12/16/21) Allowed, the case is hereby dismissed with prejudice Notice 12/23/21 | |
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Plaintiffs Kathryn Wheaton, Seafan Realty Trust LLC's Joint Motion for Withdrawal and Dismissal of this Case Applies To: Wheaton, Kathryn (Plaintiff); Seafan Realty Trust LLC (Plaintiff); 3C TCP LLC (Defendant); Touchstone Capital Partners Commercial Funding LLC (Defendant); Meade, Thomas F (Defendant) | |
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Paul N Barbadoro, Esq. added for Defendant Thomas F Meade | |
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Paul N Barbadoro, Esq. added for Defendant Touchstone Capital Partners Commercial Funding LLC | |
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Paul N Barbadoro, Esq. added for Defendant 3C TCP LLC | |
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant 3C TCP LLC, Touchstone Capital Partners Commercial Funding LLC, Thomas F Meade's Motion to dismiss all counts for Failure to State a Claim | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for extension of the preliminary restraining order and for emergency short order of notice and emergency hearing (#8.0): DENIED after hearing. plaintiff's have shown no likelihood of success on the merits. (dated 10/08/21) notice sent 10/13/21 | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for default judgment against the defendants (#10.0): DENIED (dated 10/08/21) notice sent 10/13/21 | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to strike defendants answer to plaintiff's complaint and defendant's opposition to plaintiff's motions (#11.0): DENIED (dated 10/08/21) notice sent 10/13/21 | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Objection to plaintiff's motion for default judgment and motion to strike opposition and alternatively, emergency motion for enlargement (#12.0): No Action Taken as the court has denied plaintiff's motion for default. (dated 10/08/21) notice sent 10/13/21 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.