Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Craig Equipment Corporation, Tcw Utility Services Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Wecker, Esq., Ross C, Zwillinger, Esq., Alexander Richard, against Deych, Dmitry, represented by Griffin, Esq., Stephen P, in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County, MA, . Suffolk County, MA Superior Courts with Elaine M. Buckley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeElaine M. Buckley Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 08, 2021 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: July 08, 2021Original civil complaint filed.
Date: July 08, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Prelim. Injunction and Order of Attachment (#4.0): DENIED After hearing and review of all proceedings and affidavits filed by the parties, the court DENIES the motion. While the plaintiff is a judgment holder of a debt owed by defendant Deych, that judgment is individual to Deych. Deych's current position as member and manager of East Cottage Residences, a separate business entity, does not allow this court to attach the assets of the LLC. While Deych does have distributions individual to him from East Cottage under Sec. VI of the operating agreement for the LLC Plaintiff has not sought Trustee Process of those payments from East Cottage LLC to Deych. Further plaintiff has not presented any affidavits or evidence upon which the court could find East Cottage was set up by Deych as a means to avoid payment of the judgment. Mere suspicion without more is insufficient (dated 8/9/21) notice sent 8/11/21 | |
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer to original complaint Applies To: Deych, Dmitry (Defendant) | |
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Stephen P Griffin, Esq. added for Reach & Apply Defendant East Cottage Residences LLC | |
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Stephen P Griffin, Esq. added for Defendant Dmitry Deych | |
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer to original complaint Applies To: East Cottage Residences LLC (Reach & Apply Defendant) | |
August 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit Applies To: Deych, Dmitry (Defendant) | |
August 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Hearing on Preliminary Injunction scheduled on: 08/05/2021 02:45 PM Has been: Held as Scheduled Hon. Elaine M Buckley, Presiding Staff: Melissa Doris, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
Judge: Buckley, Elaine M |
|
August 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Hearing for Real Estate Attachment scheduled on: 08/05/2021 02:45 PM Has been: Held as Scheduled Hon. Elaine M Buckley, Presiding Staff: Melissa Doris, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
Judge: Buckley, Elaine M |
|
August 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Hearing on Trustee Process scheduled on: 08/05/2021 02:45 PM Has been: Held as Scheduled Hon. Elaine M Buckley, Presiding Staff: Melissa Doris, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
Judge: Buckley, Elaine M |
|
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Counsel, Ross C. Wecker |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.