Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Trevor Blake Sole Trustee Of Blake & Sydney Realty Trust, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Mckenzie, Esq., Denzil D, against Anne J Raimondi As Director, Estate Of Robert A Raimondi Sr And Th E Heirs Of Robert A Raimondi Sr, Paul Mccormack As Director, R & R Sales Inc Formerly Known As R-R Sales Incorporated Successor By Merger To New England Lumber Sales Company Inc Now Known As New England Lumber Inc, represented by Schrier, Esq., Stuart Ted, in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County, MA, . Suffolk County, MA Superior Courts with Robert N. Tochka presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert N. Tochka Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 25, 2019 |
CategoryReal Property |
Last RefreshedJuly 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, MA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Civil action cover sheet filed. (150,000.00) (TRK)
Date: June 25, 2019Original civil complaint filed.
Date: June 25, 2019ORDER: for alternative service by Publication Notice Sent 10/4/19
Date: October 02, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Timothy Andrew Montague Fraser, Esq. dismissed/withdrawn for Plaintiff Trevor Blake Sole Trustee of Blake & Sydney Realty Trust | |
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Received from Defendant Estate of Robert A Raimondi Sr and th e Heirs of Robert A Raimondi Sr: Answer with claim for trial by jury; | |
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Stuart Ted Schrier, Esq. added for Defendant Estate of Robert A Raimondi Sr and th e Heirs of Robert A Raimondi Sr | |
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Order of Notice by Publication, returned SERVED Published in Boston Globe 11/5/19 Applies To: R & R Sales Inc formerly known as R-R Sales Incorporated successor by merger to New England Lumber Sales Company Inc now known as New England Lumber Inc (Defendant); Anne J Raimondi as Director (Defendant); Paul McCormack as Director (Defendant); Estate of Robert A Raimondi Sr and th e Heirs of Robert A Raimondi Sr (Defendant) | |
January 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant R & R Sales Inc formerly known as R-R Sales Incorporated successor by merger to New England Lumber Sales Company Inc now known as New England Lumber Inc: Service made via publication; | |
November 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to extend tracking order; (#5.0): ALLOWED (dated 11/27/19) notice sent 11/29/19 | |
November 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Trevor Blake Sole Trustee of Blake & Sydney Realty Trust's Motion to extend tracking order | |
October 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Decision rendered on matter taken under advisement: Motion Hearing scheduled on: 10/02/2019 02:00 PM Has been: Decision rendered Hon. Robert N Tochka, Presiding Staff: Norman W Huggins, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
Judge: Tochka, Robert N |
|
October 02, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER: for alternative service by Publication Notice Sent 10/4/19 | |
September 20, 2019 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear Sent On: 09/20/2019 12:03:08 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.