Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Smith, William, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Mcdonough, Esq., Suzanne C, against Kochav, M.D., Jonathan, Lubitz, M.D., Steven, Sanders, M.D., Jason L, represented by Banfield, Esq., Kyle J, Lavoie, Esq., Christopher, in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County, MA, . Suffolk County, MA Superior Courts with Elaine M. Buckley presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2018 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, MA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Attorney appearance On this date K. Banfield, Esq. added for Defendant Jason L Sanders, M.D.
Date: October 15, 2019Received from Defendant Kochav, M.D., Jonathan: Answer with claim for trial by jury;
Date: March 18, 2019Received from Defendant Lubitz, M.D., Steven: Answer with claim for trial by jury;
Date: March 18, 2019Service Returned for Defendant Sanders, M.D., Jason L: Service accepted by counsel;
Date: March 13, 2019Service Returned for Defendant Lubitz, M.D., Steven: Service accepted by counsel;
Date: March 13, 2019Service Returned for Defendant Kochav, M.D., Jonathan: Service accepted by counsel;
Date: March 13, 2019Original civil complaint filed. $500000.00 TRK
Date: December 31, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for Letters Rogatory for the Deposition of Kelsey Lau-Min, M.D. (#24.0): ALLOWED (dated 6/30/20) notice sent 7/3/20 | |
July 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Letters Rogatory for the Deposition of Kelsey Lau-Min, M.D. Judge: Donatelle, Hon. Sharon
Judge: Donatelle, Sharon |
|
June 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Plaintiff(s) William Smith motion filed for Letters Rogatory for the Deposition of Kelsey Lau-Min, M.D. (w/o opposition) | |
October 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date K. Banfield, Esq. added for Defendant Jason L Sanders, M.D. | |
October 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Stacy E Drackwicz, Esq. dismissed/withdrawn for Defendant Jason L Sanders, M.D. | |
October 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Stacy E Drackwicz, Esq. dismissed/withdrawn for Defendant Jonathan Kochav, M.D. | |
October 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Stacy E Drackwicz, Esq. dismissed/withdrawn for Defendant Steven Lubitz, M.D. | |
October 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date K. Banfield, Esq. added for Defendant Steven Lubitz, M.D. | |
October 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date K. Banfield, Esq. added for Defendant Jonathan Kochav, M.D. | |
August 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
The medical malpractice tribunal made up of Hon. Elaine M Buckley, Dr. Robert Shulman MD and Michelle Mannix, Esq., having met on 08/19/2019 09:00 AM Malpractice Tribunal reports that there is sufficient evidence to raise a legitimate question as to liability appropriate for judicial inquiry. Judge: Buckley, Hon. Elaine M Applies To: Lubitz, M.D., Steven (Defendant)
Judge: Buckley, Elaine M |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.