Case Last Refreshed: 5 years ago
Jean M. Martin, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Pro Se, against Trinity Property Consultants Kathy Havanka-Agent, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts Superior Court of Napa - Civil.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 07, 2004 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2019 |
|
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of Napa - Civil |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 16, 2005 | Action |
Other Converted Document 781110-Documents Prior to 5-17-05 Filed/Issued By: DOCUMENTS PRIOR TO 5-17-05 [781110] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
|
June 08, 2004 | Hearing |
Court Trial 215520-Hearing: Small Claims - O/C; Martin, J. vs. Trinity Property Consultants (L) ; Judge: J21460 Williams Michael Judge: Michael Williams |
|
June 08, 2004 | Action |
Converted Stat Closure Disposition Date: Jun 8 2004 Type: 223630 - SCV-Judgment: Court Manner : 212110 - Court Trial: Completed |
|
April 28, 2004 | Action |
Warrant: Issued 232110-Proof of Service Filed/Issued By: 912120 - Plaintiff Pro Per |
|
April 07, 2004 | Action |
Documents Prior to 5-17-05 DOCUMENTS PRIOR TO 5-17-2005 |
|
January 01, 1800 | Action |
Other DOCUMENTS PRIOR TO 5-17-2005 ; ; ; ; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.