Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Cigna Corporation, filed a(n) Miscellaneous Civil Actions case in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County, MA, . Suffolk County, MA Superior Courts with Leibensperger, Edward P presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLeibensperger, Edward P Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 27, 2018 |
CategoryMiscellaneous Civil Actions |
Last RefreshedJuly 13, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSuffolk County, MA |
|
Original civil complaint filed. Deposition - ALLOWED 2/27/18 Judge: Wilkins, Hon. Douglas H
Date: February 27, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 13, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT: Failure to prosecute and appear for 12/13/2018 02:00 PM Conference to Review Status, complaint of Cigna Corporation is dismissed without prejudice. DISMISSED for failure to file motion to extend entered on docket pursuant to Mass R Civ P 58(a) and notice sent to parties pursuant to Mass R Civ P 77(d) | |
December 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff Cigna Corporation's Motion to continue / reschedule an event conference to review status; This case shall be closed by final judgment on March 17, 2019 unless a motion to extend is filed. dated 12/13/18 notice sent 12/17/18 Judge: Wilkins, Hon. Douglas H
Judge: Douglas HWilkins |
|
December 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Conference to Review Status scheduled on: 12/13/2018 02:00 PM Has been: Rescheduled For the following reason: Request of Plaintiff Hon. Douglas H Wilkins, Presiding Appeared: Staff: Jane M Mahon, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
Judge: Wilkins, Douglas H |
|
December 04, 2018 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear Sent On: 12/04/2018 09:28:56 | |
December 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Conference to Review Status scheduled on: 12/11/2018 02:00 PM Has been: Rescheduled For the following reason: By Court prior to date Hon. Edward P Leibensperger, Presiding Appeared: Staff: Jane M Mahon, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
Judge: Leibensperger, Edward P |
|
September 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Julie Ann Frohlich, Esq. added for Petitioner Cigna Corporation | |
September 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Andrea Charna Kramer, Esq. added for Petitioner Cigna Corporation | |
September 07, 2018 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear Sent On: 09/07/2018 12:08:14 | |
September 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Conference to Review Status scheduled on: 09/11/2018 02:00 PM Has been: Rescheduled For the following reason: Request of Plaintiff Hon. Edward P Leibensperger, Presiding Appeared: Staff: Jane M Mahon, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
Judge: Leibensperger, Edward P |
|
August 29, 2018 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear Sent On: 08/29/2018 15:43:20 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.