Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
98 Brookline Ave Associates Llc, filed a(n) Agency Action - Administrative case represented by Suny, Esq., David R, against Massachusetts Architectural Access Board Llc, represented by Furgang, Esq., Samuel M, in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County, MA, . Suffolk County, MA Superior Courts with Joseph F. Leighton, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2017 |
CategoryAdministrative Civil Actions |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, MA |
Matter TypeAgency Action |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 07, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT of dismissal, 98 Brookline Ave Associates LLC failed to comply with an ORDER of the Court dated 11/27/2018. It is ORDERED and ADJUDGED: that this case is DISMISSED for Failure to Comply With the Court's Order of November 27, 2017 to file a Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. entered on docket pursuant to Mass R Civ P 58(a) and notice sent to parties pursuant to Mass R Civ P 77(d) | |
November 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
It is Ordered that judgment of dismissal shall enter for failure to prosecute, thirty days from the date of this order, unless prior to that date the plaintiff has served a motion for judgment on the pleadings, and has so notified the clerk of this Court. Judge: Leighton, Hon. Joseph
Judge: Leighton, Joseph |
|
January 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Received from Defendant Massachusetts Architectural Access Board LLC: Answer to original complaint; | |
January 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Samuel M Furgang, Esq. added for Defendant Massachusetts Architectural Access Board LLC (certified copy will be filed at a later date) | |
January 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant Massachusetts Architectural Access Board LLC: Service accepted by counsel; | |
December 29, 2017 | Docket Event | Original civil complaint filed. TRK | |
December 29, 2017 | Docket Event | Civil action cover sheet filed. | |
December 29, 2017 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date David R Suny, Esq. added for Plaintiff 98 Brookline Ave Associates LLC | |
December 29, 2017 | Docket Event | Case assigned to: DCM Track X - Accelerated was added on 12/29/2017 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.