Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Contract Framing Builders Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Reidy, Esq., John S, against Nauset Construction Corporation, Travelers Casualty & Surety Company Of America, Uw4 Limited Partnership, represented by Kuehn, Esq., Elise Michelle, Mcnamara, Esq., John J, in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County, MA, . Suffolk County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 17, 2017 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
3rd Party Complaint filed.
Date: February 14, 2018Received from Defendant Nauset Construction Corporation: Answer to original complaint;
Date: January 26, 2018Original civil complaint filed. TRK
Date: November 17, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Party(s) file Stipulation of Dismissal (filed 2/4/19) as to plffs vs defts with prejudice and without costs JUDGMENT entered on docket pursuant to Mass R Civ P 58(a)as amended and notice sent to parties pursuant to Mass R Civ P 77(d) Applies To: Contract Framing Builders Inc (Plaintiff); Nauset Construction Corporation (Defendant); Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America (Defendant) | |
February 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of voluntary dismissal (41a.l.i) Applies To: UW4 Limited Partnership (Defendant) with prejudice | |
February 14, 2018 | Docket Event | 3rd Party Complaint filed. | |
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Elise Michelle Kuehn, Esq. added for Defendant Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America | |
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date John J McNamara, Esq. added for Defendant Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America | |
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Received from Defendant Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America: Answer to original complaint; | |
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Elise Michelle Kuehn, Esq. added for Defendant Nauset Construction Corporation | |
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date John J McNamara, Esq. added for Defendant Nauset Construction Corporation | |
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Received from Defendant Nauset Construction Corporation: Answer to original complaint; | |
December 22, 2017 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America: Service made in hand; (entered 12/19/17) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.