Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
O'Malley, Patrick, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Norfolk County, MA, . Norfolk County, MA Superior Courts Norfolk County Probate and Family Court with Kimberly Moses presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 06, 2021 |
CategoryEstates And Administration |
Last RefreshedAugust 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationNorfolk County, MA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseNorfolk County Probate and Family Court |
Surviving Spouse, Children, Heirs at Law
Date: August 06, 2021Decree and Order of Formal Probate
Date: September 30, 2021Citation Filed; Served as Ordered
Date: September 23, 2021Permanent Bond Approved of Personal Representative dated 09/24/2021, by Hon. Kimberly Moses
Date: September 30, 2021Closing Statement
Date: February 23, 2022Notice of Claim Discover Bank
Date: June 01, 2022Bond without Sureties
Date: August 06, 2021Proposed Order/Decree
Date: August 06, 2021Uniform Counsel Certification Form Filed by
Date: August 06, 2021Affidavit as to Military Service
Date: August 06, 2021Petition for Formal Probate
Date: August 06, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Claim Discover Bank | |
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Closing Statement | |
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Ann O'Malley assent and waiver of notice for closing statement Interested Person(s) , Filed Form MPC 455 to , , | |
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Decree and Order of Formal Probate | |
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Permanent Bond Approved of Personal Representative dated 09/24/2021, by Hon. Kimberly Moses | |
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Letters Issued. Letters of Authority for Personal Representative Sent On: 09/30/2021 14:53:11 | |
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Filed; Served as Ordered | |
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Event Resulted: Administrative Review scheduled on: 09/23/2021 09:00 AM Has been: Administrative Judicial Hon. Kimberly Moses, Presiding
Judge: Moses, Kimberly |
|
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE: Citation on Petition for Formal Adjudication issued for unsupervised administration to be published in Patriot Ledger. | |
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE: Citation on Petition for Formal Adjudication issued for unsupervised administration to be published in Patriot Ledger. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.