Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Marenghi, Eugene, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Norfolk County, MA, . Norfolk County, MA Superior Courts Norfolk County Probate and Family Court with Burchill, Hon. Jacqueline M presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 05, 2021 |
CategoryEstates And Administration |
Last RefreshedAugust 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationNorfolk County, MA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseNorfolk County Probate and Family Court |
Motion To Waive Sureties Of Bond
Date: August 05, 2021Affidavit as to Military Service
Date: August 05, 2021Affidavit Of Petitioner
Date: August 05, 2021Interested Person(s) , Filed Form MPC 455 to , ,
Date: October 08, 2021Interested Person(s) , Filed Form MPC 455 to , ,
Date: October 08, 2021Interested Person(s) , Filed Form MPC 455 to , ,
Date: October 08, 2021Petition for Formal Probate
Date: August 05, 2021Bond without Sureties
Date: August 05, 2021Surviving Spouse, Children, Heirs at Law
Date: August 05, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Judgment/Decree on Complete Settlement entered on 05/30/2023 Related to File Reference # 35 | |
January 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Event Resulted: Administrative Review scheduled on: 01/27/2023 09:00 AM Has been: Administrative Judicial Unassigned, Presiding | |
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Maureen LaRoche Interested Person(s) , Filed Form MPC 455 to Assent/Waive Notice to Ptn for Complete Settlement, , | |
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Linda Kolb Interested Person(s) , Filed Form MPC 455 to Assent/Waive Notice to Ptn for Complete Settlement, , | |
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Jennifer MacDonough Interested Person(s) , Filed Form MPC 455 to Assent/Waive Notice to Ptn for Complete Settlement, , | |
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Jeannie Bland Interested Person(s) , Filed Form MPC 455 to Assent/Waive Notice to Ptn for Complete Settlement, , | |
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Eugenia Peirce Interested Person(s) , Filed Form MPC 455 to Assent/Waive Notice to Ptn for Complete Settlement, , | |
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Marsha foster Interested Person(s) , Filed Form MPC 455 to Assent/Waive Notice to Ptn for Complete Settlement, , | |
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event | John G Marenghi Interested Person(s) , Filed Form MPC 455 to Assent/Waive Notice to Ptn for Complete Settlement, , | |
December 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Citation Filed; Served as Ordered |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.