Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Merrimack Valley Credit Union, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Gray, Esq., Wayne M, against Denton, Fitz L., in the jurisdiction of Norfolk County, MA, . Norfolk County, MA Superior Courts with Joseph F. Leighton, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 19, 2024 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedApril 21, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNorfolk County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
This complaint involves a breach of contract case between Merrimack Valley Credit Union and Fitz L. Denton. The Defendant purchased a 2017 Lamborghini Huracan for $103,050.00 and was obligated to make monthly payments of $1,503.88 starting from Septe...
Plaintiff(s) Merrimack Valley Credit Union's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction
Date: April 19, 2024Merrimack Valley Credit Union's MOTION for appointment of Special Process Server.
Date: April 19, 2024Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: April 19, 2024Original civil complaint filed.
Date: April 19, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Plaintiff(s) Merrimack Valley Credit Union's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction | |
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Merrimack Valley Credit Union's MOTION for appointment of Special Process Server. | |
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Civil action cover sheet filed. | |
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Original civil complaint filed. | |
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Plaintiff(s) Merrimack Valley Credit Union's MOTION for Short Order of Notice Applies To: Denton, Fitz L. (Defendant) | |
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion for special process server (#5.0): ALLOWED Motion is Allowed. (Leighton, J) (Dated: 4/19/2024) Judge: Leighton, Hon. Joseph
Judge: Leighton, Joseph |
|
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Summons and order of notice issued on a Complaint for a Preliminary Injunction under prayer 1(a)(b)(c)(d)(e), returnable on 04/24/2024 02:00 PM Hearing on Preliminary Injunction. | |
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Complaint Order of Notice to Issue under prayer 1(a)(b)(c)(d)(e) Returnable April 24, 2024 (in person) (Leighton, J) (Dated: 4/19/2024) Judge: Leighton, Hon. Joseph
Judge: Leighton, Joseph |
|
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Case assigned to: DCM Track F - Fast Track was added on 04/19/2024 | |
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Wayne M Gray, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Plaintiff Merrimack Valley Credit Union |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.