Case Last Refreshed: 4 weeks ago
Commonwealth Of Massachusetts, filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case represented by Colman, Esq., Stephen J, against Twenty Eight Thousand, in the jurisdiction of Norfolk County, MA, . Norfolk County, MA Superior Courts with Joseph F. Leighton, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 02, 2024 |
CategoryAdministrative Civil Actions |
Last RefreshedApril 04, 2024 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationNorfolk County, MA |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Endorsement on Motion for Order of Notice (#3.0): ALLOWED (dated 4/3/2024) ns ni
Date: April 03, 2024Civil action cover sheet filed. (Rec'd 4/1/2024)
Date: April 02, 2024Original civil complaint filed.(Rec'd 4/1/2024)
Date: April 02, 2024ORDER: ORDER OF NOTICE (dated 4/3/2024) ns ni
Date: April 03, 2024Affidavit of Trevor A. Clark, Randolph Police Department Detective
Date: April 02, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for Order of Notice (#3.0): ALLOWED (dated 4/3/2024) ns ni | |
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
Preliminary Order to secure and hold: It is ORDERED and ADJUDGED: That the Randolph Police Department retain custody of TWENTY EIGHT THOUSAND ($28,000.00) DOLLARS U.S.C in a safe and reasonable manner during the pendency of these proceedings. (dated 4/3/2024) ns ni Judge: Leighton, Hon. Joseph
Judge: Leighton, Joseph |
|
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for Preliminary Order of Custody. (#4.0): ALLOWED (dated 4/3/2024) ns ni | |
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER: ORDER OF NOTICE (dated 4/3/2024) ns ni | |
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's PRELIMINARY MOTION to Secure and Hold (Rec'd 4/1/2024) Applies To: Twenty Eight Thousand ($28,000.00) U.S.C. (Defendant) | |
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | Civil action cover sheet filed. (Rec'd 4/1/2024) | |
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | Original civil complaint filed.(Rec'd 4/1/2024) | |
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Commonwealth of Massachusetts's Motion for Order of Notice (Rec'd 4/1/2024) | |
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Trevor A. Clark, Randolph Police Department Detective | |
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | Case assigned to: DCM Track F - Fast Track was added on 04/02/2024 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.