Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Intelycare, Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Phalen, Esq., David Christopher, against Norridge Gardens, Llc, Premier Healthcare Management, Llc, represented by Yarbro, Esq., Amy B, in the jurisdiction of Norfolk County, MA, . Norfolk County, MA Superior Courts with Joseph F. Leighton, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 20, 2022 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNorfolk County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Affidavit of Jennifer DaCosta as to matters of record (efiled 5/25/23) mc
Date: May 25, 2023Affidavit of Compliance Rule 9A (efiled 5/25/23) mc
Date: May 25, 2023Affidavit of Long-Arm Service for Defendant Norridge Gardens, LLC (E-filed 11/3/2022)
Date: November 03, 2022Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: October 20, 2022Original civil complaint filed.
Date: October 20, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event | IntelyCare, Inc's Memorandum (Supplemental Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss) (efiled 8/18/23) mc | |
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Rule 12 Hearing scheduled on: 08/08/2023 09:30 AM Has been: Held as Scheduled Comments: FTR Room 8 - start time of 10:41:39. Plaintiff has until Aug 18th to file supplemental memo, Defendant has until Aug 25th. Once these documents are received, the case will be put under advisement Hon. Michael A Cahillane, Presiding
Judge: Cahillane, Michael A |
|
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to (#15.0): file a Surreply to defendants' Reply to plaintiff's opposition to defendants' Motion to dismiss. ALLOWED (dated 7/26/2023) ns ni | |
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Reply/Sur-reply Plaintiff's Surreply to defendants' Reply to plaintiff's opposition to defendants' Motion to dismiss. | |
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Opposition to (P#15) Motion for Leave to File Sur-reply to Defendant's Reply-- filed by Norridge Gardens, LLC Doing Business as Norridge Gardens, Premier Healthcare Management, LLC | |
June 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Plaintiff IntelyCare, Inc's Motion for Leave to file a Surreply to Defendants' Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. mk | |
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Defendants Norridge Gardens, LLC Doing Business as Norridge Gardens, Premier Healthcare Management, LLC's Certificate of Rule 9C (efiled 5/25/23) mc | |
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Reply/Sur-reply Defendants'' Reply to Plaintiff's opposition to Motion to dismiss (efiled 5/25/23) mc | |
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Defendants Norridge Gardens, LLC Doing Business as Norridge Gardens, Premier Healthcare Management, LLC's Request for hearing (email) | |
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Jennifer DaCosta as to matters of record (efiled 5/25/23) mc |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.