Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Karle, Robert, Woods, Kelly, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Lee, Esq., Amber Nicole, Thomsen, Esq., Stacy W, against Amedisys Holding Llc, represented by Nadreau, Esq., Joshua D, in the jurisdiction of Norfolk County, MA, . Norfolk County, MA Superior Courts with Brian A. Davis presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 29, 2021 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNorfolk County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Original civil complaint filed.
Date: October 29, 2021Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: October 29, 2021Plaintiff Kelly Woods, Robert Karle's Notice of Filing (e-Filed) dg
Date: March 09, 2023Exhibits/Appendix --Superior Court Rule 9A List of Documents (e-Filed) dg
Date: March 09, 2023Exhibits/Appendix LIST (e-Filed 3/9/2023) dg
Date: March 09, 2023Reply/Sur-reply --Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendant's Opposition (e-Filed 3/9/2023) dg
Date: March 09, 2023Defendant Amedisys Holding LLC's Notice of filing (efiled 2/24/23) mc
Date: February 27, 2023Defendant Amedisys Holding LLC's Statement of Undisputed Material Facts (efiled 2/24/23) mc
Date: February 27, 2023Defendant Amedisys Holding LLC's Notice of list of documents (efiled 2/24/23) mc
Date: February 27, 2023Exhibits/Appendix Joint Appendix for Defendant's Motion for summary judgment (efiled 2/24/23) mc
Date: February 27, 2023Defendant Amedisys Holding LLC's Motion for summary judgment (efiled 2/24/23) mc
Date: February 27, 2023Attorney appearance electronically filed.
Date: November 02, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Plaintiffs Kelly Woods, Robert Karle's Supplemental of Briefing on the Court's discretion to award attorneys' fees for unsuccessful claims(rec'd 3/23/23 4:55pm) | |
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event | General correspondence regarding Letter Brief Regarding Judicial Authority to Reduce Attorneys' Fee Awards from Joshua D. Nadreau. (E-FILED 3/23/2023) | |
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion for summary judgment, MRCP 56 After hearing, Motion is (#15.0): DENIED See Memorandum of Decision and Order. (dated 3/24/2023) ns ni Judge: Cloutier, Hon. Claudine
Judge: Cloutier, Claudine |
|
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for summary judgment, MRCP 56 Motion is (#13.0): ALLOWED after hearing. See Memorandum of Decision and Order. (dated 3/24/2023) ns ni | |
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Docket Note: Letter Brief Regarding Judicial Authority to Reduce Attorneys' Fee Awards from Joshua D. Nadreau. REJECTED from Tyler due to being already filed as P#18.0 on docket. | |
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Docket Note: Plaintiffs Kelly Woods, Robert Karle's Supplemental of Briefing on the Court's discretion to award attorneys' fees for unsuccessful claims was REJECTED on Tyler due to being already filed as P#17.0 on docket. | |
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Matter taken under advisement: Rule 56 Hearing scheduled on: 03/21/2023 10:00 AM Has been: Held - Under advisement Comments: Zoom; FTR Room 8 -start time of 10:05:25 Hon. Claudine Cloutier, Presiding
Judge: Cloutier, Claudine |
|
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
The following form was generated: Notice to Appear VIA ZOOM VIDEO on March 21, 2023 at 10:00 A.M. before Judge Cloutier on P 15.0 Plffs.' Motion for Summary Judgment; P. 15.1 Plffs.' Memo in Support; P. 15.2 Deft.'s Partial Opposition; P. 15.3 Plffs.' Reply to Deft.'s Opposition; P. 15.4 Joint Appendix List; P. 15.5 Plffs.' Statement of Undisputed Material Facts; MEETING ID IS 160 138 5572 Sent On: 03/09/2023 15:15:43 Judge: Cloutier, Hon. Claudine
Judge: Cloutier, Claudine |
|
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Kelly Woods, Robert Karle's Notice of Filing (e-Filed) dg | |
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Exhibits/Appendix --Superior Court Rule 9A List of Documents (e-Filed) dg |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.