Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Commonwealth Of Massachusetts, filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case represented by Colman, Esq., Stephen J, against Eight Thousand Three Hundred Ninety Four, Johnson, Brien, Two Cell Phones, represented by Kerner, Esq., J. Thomas, in the jurisdiction of Norfolk County, MA, . Norfolk County, MA Superior Courts with Maynard M. Kirpalani presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 06, 2021 |
CategoryAdministrative Civil Actions |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationNorfolk County, MA |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Certificate of service of attorney or Pro Se: Stephen J Colman, Esq.
Date: August 06, 2021Affidavit of Detective Mark P. Donahue
Date: August 06, 2021Defendant Brien Johnson's Assented to Motion to Schedule Status April 29, 2024
Date: October 03, 2023Certificate of service of attorney or Pro Se: J. Thomas Kerner, Esq.
Date: October 03, 2023General correspondence regarding claim by Brien Johnson (rec'd 10/13/21)
Date: October 14, 2021MOTION to Intervene as Defendant filed by Brien JohnsonAssented to (rec'd 10/13/21)
Date: October 14, 2021Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: August 06, 2021Original civil complaint filed.
Date: August 06, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Status review notice returned Request status review after April 29, 2024 (rec'd 10/3/23) Applies To: Kerner, Esq., J. Thomas (Attorney) on behalf of Johnson, Brien (Proposed Property Owner) | |
October 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Defendant Brien Johnson's Assented to Motion to Schedule Status April 29, 2024 | |
October 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to schedule a status after April 29, 2024.---Motion is (#10.0): ALLOWED The Clerk shall schedule a status conference in May 2024. (dated 10/3/2023) ns ni Judge: Cahillane, Hon. Michael A | |
October 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of service of attorney or Pro Se: J. Thomas Kerner, Esq. | |
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER sent for Status Review, if notice is not received by 10/05/2023 the complaint will be dismissed. | |
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Received from Defendant-Intervenor Johnson, Brien: Answer with claim for trial by jury;-tracking notice sent to attorney Kerner | |
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion to intervene as a claimant by Brien Johnson (#7.0): ALLOWED as assented to (Kirpalani, J)(dated;10/22/21) ns pl Judge: Kirpalani, Hon. Maynard
Judge: Kirpalani, Maynard |
|
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of service of attorney or Pro Se: J. Thomas Kerner, Esq.Brien Johnson (rec'd 10/13/21) | |
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date J. Thomas Kerner, Esq. added for Proposed Property Owner Brien Johnson | |
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event | General correspondence regarding claim by Brien Johnson (rec'd 10/13/21) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.