Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
The Norfolk And Dedham Group, filed a(n) Criminal Related (Civil) - Criminal case represented by Fragomeni, Jr., Esq., Frank L, against Commonwealth Of Massachusetts Salem District Court, represented by Ryan, Esq., Tonie Jhun, in the jurisdiction of Norfolk County, MA, . Norfolk County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 04, 2021 |
CategoryActions Involving The State/Municipality |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationNorfolk County, MA |
Matter TypeCriminal Related (Civil) |
Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: August 04, 2021Attorney appearance electronically filed.
Date: November 04, 2021Original civil complaint filed.
Date: August 04, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Party(s) file Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice and without costs waiving all rights of appeal. Applies To: The Norfolk and Dedham Group (Plaintiff); Commonwealth of Massachusetts/Salem District Court (Defendant) | |
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer to original complaint Answer and Jury Demand of Defendant Commonwealth of Massachusetts/Salem District Court (efiled 11/4/21) Applies To: Commonwealth of Massachusetts/Salem District Court (Defendant) | |
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance electronically filed. | |
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Tonie Jhun Ryan, Esq. added as Attorney for the Commonwealth for Defendant Commonwealth of Massachusetts/Salem District Court (efiled 11/4/21) | |
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant Commonwealth of Massachusetts/Salem District Court: Service made in hand; to Support services, agent and person in charge at the time of service for Commonwealth of Massachusetts on 9/21/2021 | |
August 14, 2021 | Docket Event | One Trial case reviewed by Clerk, case to remain in the Superior Court. Judge: Hickey, Mary K | |
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil action cover sheet filed. | |
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Original civil complaint filed. | |
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Note: 2 summons sent on this day | |
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Case assigned to: DCM Track A - Average was added on 08/04/2021 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.